Trustees DEAFINITIONS LIMITED
Charity number: 1144504
Charity reporting is up to date (92 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RANJIT SINGH | Chair | 01 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Sutcliffe | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zafar Zaman | Trustee | 21 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Rhodes | Trustee | 17 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Peacock | Trustee | 09 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Robin Herdman | Trustee | 21 February 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.