Trustees CHRIST CHURCH, EAST DULWICH
Charity number: 1143773
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Massah Sawi | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colin Leslie Watson | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Sackey | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kim McCrossan | Trustee | 27 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bendov Ansa-Otu | Trustee | 27 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Mills Lanquaye FCCA | Trustee | 27 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lurline Scott | Trustee | 27 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Alan Markay MA, MDiv | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
LURLEEN CRICHLOW | Trustee | 31 January 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.