Financial history THE ST BENET'S TRUST

Charity number: 1143350
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £1.36m £1.05m £1.04m £1.30m £2.92m
Total expenditure £1.34m £1.08m £1.14m £1.29m £1.30m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £755.84k £337.11k £337.11k £532.00k £2.07m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £604.98k £707.69k £707.69k £763.00k £826.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £19.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.27m £988.00k £1.05m £1.17m £1.21m
Expenditure - Raising funds £68.44k £88.00k £87.97k £120.00k £95.00k
Expenditure - Governance £3.00k £6.00k £6.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0