Trustees SOUTHAM LIONS CLUB CHARITABLE TRUST FUND
Charity number: 1143392
Charity reporting is overdue by 8 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Richards | Trustee | 22 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Guy | Trustee | 10 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID THING | Trustee | 10 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BARR | Trustee | 08 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY WALKER MACDONALD LORIMER | Trustee | 16 August 2011 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.