Trustees THE COLLEGE OF ST PETER LE BAILEY IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD
Charity number: 1143166
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
40 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Judith Buchanan | Chair | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Janet Whalley | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adam Kirrander | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Cora Gilroy-Ware | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Prof Robert Hilton | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Prof Sarah Hill | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Robert Burrell | Trustee | 14 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Lavanya Rajamani | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr David Alonso Monge | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Christl Donnelly | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|||||
Dr Joanna Neilly | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR CHARLES MONROE | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr STEPHEN DAVID TUFFNELL | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr DOROTA LECZYKIEWICZ | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Marc Macias-Fauria | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR STEPHEN BAXTER | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|||||
Professor MARINA MACKAY | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr INES MORENO DE BARREDA | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR DANNY DORLING | Trustee | 08 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR PHILLIP ROTHWELL | Trustee | 08 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Daron Burrows | Trustee | 08 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR THOMAS ADCOCK | Trustee | 30 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR SONDRA HAUSNER | Trustee | 30 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR PETER TAYLOR MA PhD FRCP | Trustee | 28 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR CYRUS COOPER OBE | Trustee | 28 January 2013 |
|
|||||
Dr MASSIMO ANTONINI | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr TIMOTHY MAWSON | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR ABIGAIL WILLIAMS | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR CHRISTOPHER JOHN FOOT | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr HUW DORKINS FRCP FRCPATH | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR NICHOLAS LAKIN | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr PETER KAIL | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR LIONEL MASON | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr HARTMUT MAYER | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR MARK MOLONEY | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR DARIUSZ WOJCIK | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr RICARDO MIGUEL SANTOS SOARES DE OLIVEIRA | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR MICHAEL BONSALL | Trustee | 20 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr CLAIRE WILLIAMS | Trustee | 20 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr GEOFFREY NICHOLLS | Trustee | 20 July 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.