Financial history AL SADDIIQ CULTURAL CENTRE (ASC)

Charity number: 1150020
Charity reporting is overdue by 369 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2017 01/04/2018 01/04/2019 01/04/2020 01/04/2021
Total gross income £28.40k £57.50k £60.00k £66.46k £36.75k
Total expenditure £28.40k £57.40k £59.40k £65.34k £37.95k
Income from government contracts £28.40k £42.50k £41.50k £42.76k £20.00k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A