THAMES GATEWAY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1143514
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £7.78k £2.91k £11.35k £12 £14
Total expenditure £16.71k £11.89k £7.13k £4.81k £5.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A