Financial history PONTYPRIDD YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1143409
Charity reporting is overdue by 30 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £81.71k £32.59k £448.36k £2.01m £2.00m
Total expenditure £55.47k £49.82k £148.63k £56.27k £26.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £5.98k N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £309.00k £897.00k £250.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £2.01m £2.00m
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £55.07k £22.75k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £1.20k £3.45k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £2.95k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0