Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS WITH HOLY TRINITY, WANDSWORTH
Charity number: 1143840
Charity reporting is up to date (83 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Nicholas Bisson | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Paul Tucker | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Nicola Taylor | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Jane Carpenter | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
GARY BOYD CARPENTER | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
DANIEL CHRISTOPHER JONES | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Andrew Peter O'Brien | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
JOHN MICHAEL SAILER | Trustee | 14 May 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
HANNAH GRACE RIDLEY | Trustee | 14 May 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
JEREMY DAVID CRUMPLIN | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
KIMGHECH LUY | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
DOLAPO DELLA OGUNLEYE | Trustee | 06 July 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Carl David Hughes | Trustee | 18 August 2013 |
|
|||||||||
OLANIYI OGUNSINA | Trustee | 12 October 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
PAUL RICHARD ASHWORTH | Trustee | 07 August 2011 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.