THE ECOLOGICAL SEQUESTRATION TRUST

Charity number: 1143397
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £791.12k £237.90k £188.49k £143.73k £265.56k
Total expenditure £1.05m £410.04k £247.48k £165.80k £133.48k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £76.05k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £250 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £11.57k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £779.31k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.05m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £15.60k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £640.96k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A