THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY AND ALL SAINTS, TRENTHAM

Charity number: 1144889
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Suzanne Copestick Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record
JAMES DANIEL PALMER Trustee 23 April 2017 None on record
STUART ANDREW MOCHRIE Trustee 17 April 2016 None on record
Rev ADRIAN GORDON STONE Chair 07 September 2017
THE LADY KATHERINE AND SIR RICHARD LEVESON CHARITY Received: On time
TRENTHAM PARISH HALL Received: On time
EDITH EMILY TODD Received: On time
JONATHAN DANIEL MUELLER Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record
SUSAN ELIZABETH COOKE Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
LESLEY JEAN SYMON Trustee 23 April 2017 None on record
SUSAN MASSEY Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
JAMES ALLEN Trustee 17 April 2016 None on record
JANET DANIELS Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
IRIS BARCROFT Trustee 12 April 2015
EDITH EMILY TODD Received: On time
Robert Stanway Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record
SUSAN ELIZABETH THOMAS Trustee 23 April 2017 None on record
DAVID KINGSLEY FINN Trustee 02 December 2011
EDITH EMILY TODD Received: On time
LISA MARIE WALTERS Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record