Accounts and annual returns LEWISHAM ETHNIC MINORITY PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1147680
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 189 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 189 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 554 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 554 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 March 2020 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 03 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required