AMBER CRISIS PREGNANCY CARE

Charity number: 1143127
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £9.09k £10.11k £7.01k £18.50k £25.83k
Total expenditure £7.92k £4.35k £6.53k £13.41k £16.60k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A