AFFECTING REAL CHANGE

Charity number: 1143942
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £66.00k £47.02k £26.66k £15.59k £21.48k
Total expenditure £61.35k £53.21k £24.77k £19.00k £20.39k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A