Trustees THE LIZARD AND MOUNTS BAY METHODIST CIRCUIT
Charity number: 1144190
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
85 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev DANIEL PAUL REED | Chair | 20 September 2012 |
|
|||||
Theresa Mary Hosking | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Rachel Pearl Coulston | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Karen Carpenter | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alan John Harper | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Bishop | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Jane Shainberg | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Diane Elizabeth Grice | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Roland Rodda | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rex Tremayne | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Douglas Boston | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA RETALLACK | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
HELEN ROGERS | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Paul Richards | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
David Pascoe | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Pam Furby | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Karen Scannell | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
ESTHER BENNEY | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Marion Pollock | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARY JENKING | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Irene Sampson | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Mitchell | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
SUE WILLIAMS | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Annie Searle | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Steve Allen | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
James Tripconey | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Pollard | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Flinders | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev Stephen Bales | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Tremayne | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
NIKKI JENKIN | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Reed | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Verna Tripconey | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
LYNN BOWDEN | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
PAUL JENKIN | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
PAUL TRIGGS | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mark Bayliss | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
ISAAC MCNISH | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Joy Semmens | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrew Hill | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
JANET INGS | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE REED | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|||||
MARGARET NOTLEY | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev Amanda Stevens | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
HAZEL TRELOAR | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIA RICHARDS | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
TONY INGS | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
JANET LIESKE | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
LUCETTE KITTO | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
NEIL DIDLICK | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Spong | Trustee | 19 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rev DAVID POUNTAIN | Trustee | 19 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Edna Angove | Trustee | 19 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Thora Hill | Trustee | 19 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL FLEETWOOD | Trustee | 19 December 2013 |
|
|||||
Paul James Combellack | Trustee | 19 December 2013 |
|
|||||
ESTELLE TURNER | Trustee | 19 December 2013 |
|
|||||
CHRIS SMITH | Trustee | 20 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
JANET HEARN | Trustee | 10 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
ROGER WILLIAM RICHARDS | Trustee | 10 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DENIS BILKEY | Trustee | 10 October 2011 |
|
|||||
COLIN COMBELLACK | Trustee | 10 October 2011 |
|
|||||
SHIRLEY WEARNE | Trustee | 10 October 2011 |
|
|||||
SUSAN ANNETTE BENNETTS | Trustee | 10 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
Rev PHILIP DERYK WILLIAMS | Trustee | 10 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY BRAY | Trustee | 10 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
JANET VERRAN | Trustee | 10 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
PASTOR BILL REED | Trustee | 10 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARY BLOOMFIELD | Trustee | 10 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL JOHN FERRIS | Trustee | 10 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
MOLLY ALBOROUGH SMITH | Trustee | 10 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
FREDERICK JOHN COCK | Trustee | 10 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
REV PAUL MARTYN BENNEY | Trustee | 10 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
DONALD HEARN | Trustee | 10 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET WINIFRED EVA | Trustee | 10 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
REV BEVERLY TURNER | Trustee | 10 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL JENNIFER TONKIN | Trustee | 10 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
STEPHANIE GORDON | Trustee | 10 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANNE CAROLYN MOYLE | Trustee | 10 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
SANDY KATHERINE FAIRLESS | Trustee | 10 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
FRANKLYN ALBERT MOYLE | Trustee | 10 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
THELMA ANN SEDGEMAN | Trustee | 30 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
URSULA CADDY | Trustee | 30 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
JENNY LEWIS | Trustee | 30 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPHINE ELIZABETH HERBERT | Trustee | 30 August 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.