Trustees THE DU MAURIER FESTIVAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 1143916
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yvette Gamble | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Willmore | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Bennett | Trustee | 03 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Hubbarde | Trustee | 29 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Libby Shaw | Trustee | 12 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
LYNN MARY GOOLD | Trustee | 22 September 2011 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.