Financial history PENNYWELL YOUTH PROJECT

Charity number: 1143789
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £269.83k £303.33k £284.52k £377.54k £425.73k
Total expenditure £238.15k £318.42k £346.79k £359.06k £411.73k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A £43.89k N/A
Income from government grants £0 £46.38k £17.43k £16.06k £131.71k