Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST, CHESTER

Charity number: 1144003
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jennifer Ruth Maddock Trustee 11 October 2020
THE CHESTER ARCHAEOLOGICAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
Jeremy Marten Jones Trustee 11 October 2020
None on record
Ottilia Nyakatawa Trustee 11 October 2020
None on record
Timothy John Leaman Trustee 11 October 2020
None on record
SIMON GREY OLIVER Trustee 26 April 2018
THE LANCASHIRE PARISH REGISTER SOCIETY
Received: On time
Pauline Corner Trustee 28 May 2016
None on record
RACHEL ELISABETH BARLOW Trustee 27 September 2011
None on record
KEITH EDWARD ALLEN BSc Trustee 27 September 2011
None on record
Rev DAVID NIGEL CHESTERS Trustee 22 September 2011
THE QUEEN'S SCHOOL CHESTER
Recently registered
THE QUEEN'S SCHOOL CHESTER
Received: On time