Trustees 1ST ADDERBURY SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1145133
Charity reporting is overdue by 167 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Wingrove | Chair | 05 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Williams | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Tzambazles | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gabriel Wingrove | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Mark Osborne | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Francis Gosling | Trustee | 14 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Darren Millward | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Mann | Trustee | 02 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Phipps | Trustee | 06 May 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.