Financial history PERTH COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1146204
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £53.12k £20.27k £14.29k £39.29k £10.37k
Total expenditure £62.08k £25.50k £14.05k £23.61k £15.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £10.00k N/A