Trustees LONDON METROPOLITAN UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' UNION
Charity number: 1153293
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Wing Hong To | Chair | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mojahar Ali | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Damilola Olasope | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Manpreet Kaur | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margarita Damai | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tammika Chambers | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Myles Doran | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Irene Fufeyin | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Wenjie Lee | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.