CUTHBERT CARTER FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1144913
Charity reporting is overdue by 123 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019
Total gross income £3.50k £2.79k £1.50k £1.50k £1.60k
Total expenditure £2.50k £1.80k £1.20k £1.00k £1.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A