Financial history BOURNEMOUTH ALEVI CULTURAL CENTRE

Charity number: 1147244
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £22.59k £20.94k £19.33k £17.57k £13.07k
Total expenditure £21.36k £17.68k £17.68k £16.98k £9.36k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A