RAVIDRA MUSLIM EDUCATION, SOCIAL & WELFARE TRUST UK

Charity number: 1145608
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £2.40k £1.35k £13.62k £63.48k £30.68k
Total expenditure £1.51k £527 £7.40k £24.13k £27.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A