Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, DENHAM
Charity number: 1144358

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVD CHRISTOPH WALTER LINDNER | Chair | 04 March 2016 |
|
|||||||||||||
Charlotte Jane SMITH | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Michele Ganley Lee | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Catherine Elizabeth MacQueen | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Dr Christopher Neil Macqueen | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Dominic William Guy Birkby | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Kathleen Frances Anderson | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Brian Thomas O Regan | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Sandra Elaine Wickenden | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Janet Elizabeth Allen | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||
Michael Stewart | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Dexter Robert Gregory Brown | Trustee | 07 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Kathryn Jean Paine | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||
MICHAEL ALAN CARMODY | Trustee | 20 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||||
SAMANTHA DERBYSHIRE CARTER | Trustee | 20 October 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Kathryn Jane SOLE | Trustee | 21 May 2003 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.