Trustees ONE-EIGHTY LIMITED
Charity number: 1147546
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tina Ann Elder | Chair | 12 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Andrew William Davison | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nikki Aitchison | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daphne James | Trustee | 15 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa-Marie Jones | Trustee | 27 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Souter | Trustee | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hilary Johnson | Trustee | 08 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Thomas David Gardiner | Trustee | 04 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alison Clare Pierazzini | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN FISHER | Trustee | 10 June 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.