Financial history The River Church Chelmsford Ltd

Charity number: 1144804
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £159.68k £207.28k £256.81k £272.83k £473.20k
Total expenditure £172.95k £184.76k £204.14k £280.27k £289.73k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A