THE WESTMINSTER SCHOOL FOUNDATION (UK) LIMITED

Charity number: 1144823
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £123.68k £30.76k £15.50k £15.13k £122.50k
Total expenditure £58.07k £122.09k £19.57k £25.81k £125.80k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A