Trustees ST. JOHN'S METHODIST CHURCH PARKFIELD
Charity number: 1146373
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
26 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Stephen Jackson | Chair | 25 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
IAN RONALD PRIEST | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Basil Coward | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hugo Robinson | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dalsie Robinson | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev William Davis | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Norma Levett | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Martine Caffyn | Trustee | 28 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lianne French | Trustee | 28 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Punfield | Trustee | 28 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Levett | Trustee | 10 May 2018 |
|
|||||
IRENE BRUMLEY | Trustee | 06 February 2015 |
|
|||||
JEAN OAKLEY | Trustee | 06 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Ethel Mudzonga | Trustee | 06 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Marcus Brown | Trustee | 06 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARCUS HEMANS | Trustee | 11 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
EMMA VEIRO | Trustee | 11 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
KENNETH GOUGH | Trustee | 11 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
GENEVA CARNEY | Trustee | 11 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
LILIAN ROUND | Trustee | 11 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
EVAN CARNEY | Trustee | 11 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA FAULKNER | Trustee | 11 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH MACER-WRIGHT | Trustee | 11 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
Rev DAVID WHEELER | Trustee | 11 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA BROWN | Trustee | 11 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
JANET PUNFIELD | Trustee | 11 March 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.