CELESTIAL CHURCH OF CHRIST CASTLE OF PEACE ON THE ROCK

Charity number: 1145991
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £8.55k £7.86k £8.75k £9.56k £9.59k
Total expenditure £6.35k £5.56k £7.55k £7.53k £7.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A