Trustees DOCKLANDS SINFONIA
Charity number: 1147781
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kathryn Elizabeth Lewis | Chair | 12 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Karen Balding | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
HAROLD SIM | Trustee | 12 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Phil Sizer | Trustee | 29 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
MRS CLARE WALKER | Trustee | 24 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
MS KIRSTY WALKER | Trustee | 24 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Clare Walker | Trustee | 17 April 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.