Financial history ZANZIBAR WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1145891
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.00k £4.00k £4.00k £4.00k £8.68k
Total expenditure £1.00k £4.00k £4.00k £2.00k £7.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A