Financial history THE KING'S COMMUNITY CHURCH HATFIELD TRUST

Charity number: 1144204
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £120.07k £135.54k £131.85k £120.09k £135.66k
Total expenditure £132.73k £123.48k £118.82k £122.35k £155.54k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £2.16k