Financial history FRIENDS OF BLANDFORD ST MARY PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1144959
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £11.47k £4.88k £1.67k £142 £2.92k
Total expenditure £17.71k £3.94k £2.46k £211 £1.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A