Trustees MANCHESTER ALLIANCE FOR COMMUNITY CARE

Charity number: 1145921
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Bethany Leslie Trustee 29 November 2023
None on record
James Hume Trustee 29 November 2023
None on record
Nicola Claire Shellens Trustee 29 November 2023
None on record
Daniel Taylor Trustee 18 July 2022
None on record
Rodger Cairns Trustee 26 February 2019
None on record
Janet Elizabeth Finucane Trustee 26 February 2019
None on record
Charles Kwaku-Odoi Trustee 10 December 2015
MANCHESTER SOUTH STREET PASTORS
Overdue by 146 days
THE FAITH NETWORK FOR MANCHESTER (FN4M)
Received: On time
MANCHESTER CITY CENTRE STREET PASTORS
Received: On time
HEALTHWATCH MANCHESTER
Received: 110 days late
COMMAND PRAYER CENTRE MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL
Received: 7 days late
Dr Julian Skyrme Trustee 14 January 2015
None on record