FORGOTTEN ANIMALS

Charity number: 1145269
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/09/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £48.77k £58.64k £103.33k £94.39k £120.08k
Total expenditure £27.70k £50.33k £99.51k £75.59k £104.31k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A