Financial history KARAMJOT

Charity number: 1145792
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £3.24k £4.87k £12.12k £20.80k £16.70k
Total expenditure £10.44k £92.94k £780 £1.58k £3.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A