Financial history ALOR DISHARI

Charity number: 1145925
Charity reporting is overdue by 60 days

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 16/08/2016 16/08/2017 16/08/2018 16/08/2019 16/08/2020
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A