Trustees PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST.LAWRENCE, STRATFORD-SUB-CASTLE, WILTS
Charity number: 1144745
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel Athelstan Afford | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Susan May Thomson | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Eloise Ferguson | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Michael Perrings Walsh | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Lloyd Woollat | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joy James | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
JAMES PLATT | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
GWYNNETH JOY JAMES | Trustee | 24 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER GEORGE LUSH | Trustee | 24 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER BRIDGET BALSTON | Trustee | 04 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE ANNE LONG | Trustee | 04 November 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.