Financial history THE DICKINSON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1144794
Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 24/10/2017 24/10/2018 24/10/2019 24/10/2020 24/10/2021
Total gross income £52.34k £52.28k £31.25k £22.70k £20.23k
Total expenditure £59.17k £49.19k £53.36k £51.58k £39.51k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A