THE OPEN SPACES SOCIETY

Charity number: 1144840
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £365.30k £736.85k £897.73k £371.10k £368.17k
Total expenditure £260.77k £299.01k £352.52k £401.82k £464.69k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £583.96k £851.10k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £6.92k £2.54k N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £118.89k £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £27.09k £44.10k N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £583.96k £728.43k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £294.36k £352.50k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £4.65k £17 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £9.03k £11.21k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A