Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF CHRIST CHURCH WEST WIMBLEDON
Charity number: 1145463
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Lotwina Sarudzayi Farodoye | Chair | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Hannaford | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Larkman | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
JULIE ELLEN GRAINGER | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES SAWULA BUYONDO | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
CHIKA NWOKOYE | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
SALLY JANINE EDMUNDS | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA VERA THURGOOD | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA MARY SPENCER | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
JUDY LUDDINGTON | Trustee | 10 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN FREDERICK DAVEY | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JANE ISOBEL SIMPSON | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor RONALD ANTHONY BARNETT | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANGELINA LOUISE SKELTON | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MAIR ALETHEA RABAGLIATI | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
PAUL LEONARD SINCLAIR | Trustee | 13 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
LYNDA ANN COLEMAN | Trustee | 16 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA ROSEMARY MOUSELL | Trustee | 16 January 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.