Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHALFONT ST PETER

Charity number: 1146043
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £237.22k £229.17k £255.40k £185.69k £197.90k
Total expenditure £300.39k £261.77k £288.88k £247.83k £214.81k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £795 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A