STRATFORD ARTS TRUST

Charity number: 1145183
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David McNeill Trustee 21 May 2015 None on record
David Kohn Trustee 12 February 2015 None on record
OLIVIER BEROUD Trustee 10 October 2013 None on record
Linden Neil Trustee 14 September 2017 None on record
Georgina Philippou Chair 26 September 2019 None on record