WEST LONDON MISSION TRUST

Charity number: 1145004
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £147.32k £145.06k £445.46k £492.47k £482.44k
Total expenditure £142.38k £167.97k £139.08k £267.58k £405.02k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A