Financial history The Origin Foundation

Charity number: 1145366
Charity reporting is overdue by 65 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/12/2017 01/12/2018 01/12/2019 01/12/2020 01/12/2021
Total gross income £143.79k £106.38k £104.44k £1.77k £7.32k
Total expenditure £153.56k £118.14k £111.23k £12.26k £8.65k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A