SUFFOLK COALITION OF DISABLED PEOPLE

Charity number: 1146878
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £107.28k £93.28k £45.47k £39.54k £10.18k
Total expenditure £75.61k £79.46k £75.02k £42.61k £36.93k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £106.60k £92.43k £36.20k £36.20k £4.00k