Financial history STEPHENS AND GEORGE CENTENARY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1146009
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £175.73k £352.57k £92.98k £234.13k £603.74k
Total expenditure £147.25k £143.39k £194.93k £217.99k £249.88k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £187.34k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £603.74k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £249.88k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.10k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0