Trustees PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER'S CHURCH. TIVERTON, DEVON.
Charity number: 1145994
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Christian Derek Jonathan Hill | Chair | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas William Mitchell | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heather Vincent | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Robert Varenne Brewster | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicolette Rosalie Johnson | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Cobbledick | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sally Mundy | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Hall-Tomkin | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kate Henshall | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Ricks Dip Archit | Trustee | 04 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
AVERIL ROSALIND LONG | Trustee | 25 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM EDWARD ZARRETT | Trustee | 20 February 2012 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR DAVID CATCHPOLE | Trustee | 20 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN HEARD | Trustee | 03 February 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.