Financial history AL HASHIM ACADEMY

Charity number: 1145970
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 15/01/2018 15/01/2019 15/01/2020 15/01/2021 15/01/2022
Total gross income £51.49k £45.45k £98.64k £55.47k £63.87k
Total expenditure £35.06k £41.48k £52.04k £27.95k £25.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A